+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services + Appropriations