+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 17, 2016: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .HB16-1120
February 9, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1120
February 9, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1120
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor