+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor