+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 19, 2013: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - COW as amended. The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
March 13, 2013: Senate Health & Human Services: FINAL VOTE -
March 13, 2013: Senate Health & Human Services: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A). The motion passed without objection.
February 15, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 9-4.
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor