+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
- Sent to the Governor
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On June 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor