+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment