+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary