+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered
- Senate Third Reading Passed
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 18, 2013: Senate Health & Human Services: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment C). The motion passed without objection.
February 27, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1115 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 8-3.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor