+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 29, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1114
April 25, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .HB16-1114
March 22, 2016: House Business Affairs and Labor: . .HB16-1114
March 22, 2016: House Business Affairs and Labor: . .HB16-1114
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor