+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary