+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 05/30/2015 - No Amendments
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/26/2015 - No Amendments
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor