+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
May 5, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1112
May 5, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1112
April 28, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1112
March 8, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1112
March 8, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1112
March 8, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1112
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor