+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment