+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 4, 2024 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 29, 2024 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 29, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 8, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 5, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 15, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 26, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor