+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Re-Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Finance + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
April 16, 2013: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.004 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
April 16, 2013: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
April 9, 2013: Senate Transportation: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 4-1.
February 21, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.009 (Attachment B). The motion passed without objection.
February 21, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 8-5.
February 13, 2013: House Transportation & Energy: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) as an amendment to L.006 (Attachment E). The motion passed without objection.
February 13, 2013: House Transportation & Energy: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment E), as amended. The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor