+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 24, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor