+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/19/2018 - No Amendments
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services