+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 17, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1104 indefinitely. The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
April 17, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1104 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion failed on a vote of 3-4.
March 24, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1104 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 3-2.
March 6, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1104 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 12-1.
January 29, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor