+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services