+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations