+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services