+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor