+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 28, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1100 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion failed on a vote of 2-3.
April 10, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 12-1.
April 10, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor