+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/22/2018 - No Amendments
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment