+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 25, 2014: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1093 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
April 23, 2014: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010. The motion passed without objection.
April 11, 2014: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 The motion passed without objection.
April 11, 2014: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1093, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 9-4.
February 4, 2014: House Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004. The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor