+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 21, 2016: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .HB16-1093
February 29, 2016: House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .HB16-1093
February 29, 2016: House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .HB16-1093
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor