+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .HB16-1090
March 9, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .HB16-1090
February 3, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1090
February 3, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1090
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor