+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 17, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection.
April 17, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection.
April 17, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1088, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 8-5.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor