+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor