+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor