+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On June 8, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 10, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance