+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 05/01/2017
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/06/2017 - No Amendments
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor