+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance