+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance