+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor