+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Refer Amended to Legislative Council
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
May 5, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1077
May 5, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1077
May 5, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1077
April 29, 2016: House Legislative Council: . .HB16-1077
April 15, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1077
April 15, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1077
January 20, 2016: House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .HB16-1077
January 20, 2016: House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .HB16-1077
January 20, 2016: House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .HB16-1077
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor