+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 5, 2015: House Health, Insurance, & Environment: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment K). The motion failed on a vote of 6-7.
February 5, 2015: House Health, Insurance, & Environment: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1075, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 9-4.
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor