+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 21, 2013: Senate Health & Human Services: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G). The motion passed without objection.
February 15, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
January 29, 2013: House Health, Insurance & Environment: FINAL VOTE - Moved to reconsider House Bill 13-1074. The motion passed on a vote of 10-1.
January 29, 2013: House Health, Insurance & Environment: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1074, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion failed on a vote of 2-9.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor