+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
- Sent to the Governor
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/26/2015
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor