+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance