+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 1, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
February 7, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1071 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
January 30, 2013: House Transportation & Energy: FINAL VOTE - Amend L.001, line 12, after "TO REGISTER" insert "OR RE-REGISTER". The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor