+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment