+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 4, 2024 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 28, 2024 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 26, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On February 12, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 9, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 8, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 5, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 10, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs