+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/23/2018 - No Amendments
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/22/2018 - No Amendments
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/21/2018 - No Amendments
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary