+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .HB16-1064
February 3, 2016: House Local Government: . .HB16-1064
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor