+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 28, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1063 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 4-0.
April 22, 2015: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1063 to the Committee on Finance. The motion passed on a vote of 9-0.
April 10, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1063, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor