+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 16, 2014: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1061 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
April 4, 2014: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1061 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor