+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations