+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 27, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1059
April 27, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1059
April 18, 2016: Senate Judiciary: . .HB16-1059
January 26, 2016: House Judiciary: . .HB16-1059
January 26, 2016: House Judiciary: . .HB16-1059
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor