+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 4, 2024 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On May 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 23, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 22, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 10, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs